|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 516, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 7. Page 6033.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 4971.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 5009.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 4948.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|