LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2007
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2007
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2007
Compare Versions
AB2007 Chaptered September 23, 2016
AB2007 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AB2007 Amended August 3, 2016
AB2007 Amended June 21, 2016
AB2007 Amended May 27, 2016
AB2007 Amended April 26, 2016
AB2007 Introduced February 16, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2007 Chaptered September 23, 2016
AB2007 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AB2007 Amended August 3, 2016
AB2007 Amended June 21, 2016
AB2007 Amended May 27, 2016
AB2007 Amended April 26, 2016
AB2007 Introduced February 16, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare