California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2007 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 3, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016