|
09/04/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 265, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2461.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1986.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1263.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|