LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB208
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB208
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB208
Compare Versions
AB208 Chaptered September 4, 2015
AB208 Enrolled August 18, 2015
AB208 Amended July 9, 2015
AB208 Amended April 21, 2015
AB208 Amended March 26, 2015
AB208 Introduced January 29, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB208 Chaptered September 4, 2015
AB208 Enrolled August 18, 2015
AB208 Amended July 9, 2015
AB208 Amended April 21, 2015
AB208 Amended March 26, 2015
AB208 Introduced January 29, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare