California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB208 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 18, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 4, 2015

Amended

Bill July 9, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015