|
08/17/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5643.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4644.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4464.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|