California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2116 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2016

Amended

Bill June 15, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016