LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2116
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2116
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2116
Compare Versions
AB2116 Chaptered August 17, 2016
AB2116 Enrolled August 2, 2016
AB2116 Amended June 15, 2016
AB2116 Amended April 14, 2016
AB2116 Introduced February 17, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2116 Chaptered August 17, 2016
AB2116 Enrolled August 2, 2016
AB2116 Amended June 15, 2016
AB2116 Amended April 14, 2016
AB2116 Introduced February 17, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare