|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 2834.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2349.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 1862.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|