LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB219
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB219
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB219
Compare Versions
AB219 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB219 Enrolled September 9, 2015
AB219 Amended August 31, 2015
AB219 Amended June 1, 2015
AB219 Amended April 14, 2015
AB219 Introduced February 2, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB219 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB219 Enrolled September 9, 2015
AB219 Amended August 31, 2015
AB219 Amended June 1, 2015
AB219 Amended April 14, 2015
AB219 Introduced February 2, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare