California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB219 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015