|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 2990.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 4. Page 3011.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2568.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 5. Page 1863.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|