California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB221 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/11/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 221ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 8, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 9, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 2, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 29, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 21, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Dababneh FEBRUARY 3, 2015 An act to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 13020) to Chapter 1 of Division 6 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 221, Dababneh. Mobile application: driver's licenses and identification cards. Existing law requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue to a person a driver's license as applied for when the department determines that the applicant is lawfully entitled to a license. Existing law requires the license to state specified information, including the true full name, age, and mailing address of the licensee and a brief description and engraved picture or photograph of the licensee for the purpose of identification. Existing law authorizes the department to issue an identification card to any person attesting to his or her true full name, correct age, and other identifying data as certified by the applicant for the identification card. This bill would require the Department of Motor Vehicles to study the feasibility of creating a digital mobile driver's license application for smartphone use. The bill would require the study to consider the security of personal information, compliance with federal standards, and the limitations of available technology. The bill would require the department to report the results of the study to the Legislature on or before December 1, 2016. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Article 6 (commencing with Section 13020) is added to Chapter 1 of Division 6 of the Vehicle Code, to read: Article 6. Mobile Application 13020. (a) The department shall study the feasibility of creating a digital mobile driver's license application for smartphone use. The study shall consider, at a minimum, the security of personal information, compliance with federal standards, and the limitations of available technology. (b) On or before December 1, 2016, the department shall report the results of the study described in subdivision (a) to the Legislature. The report shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code. The requirement for submitting a report imposed by this subdivision is inoperative on December 1, 2020, pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code.