California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB221 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Amended

Bill July 2, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 29, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015