|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 824, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 6540.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5487.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 24. Page 5188.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|