California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2251 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill May 10, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016