LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2251
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2251
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2251
Compare Versions
AB2251 Chaptered September 29, 2016
AB2251 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB2251 Amended August 19, 2016
AB2251 Amended August 1, 2016
AB2251 Amended June 13, 2016
AB2251 Amended May 31, 2016
AB2251 Amended May 10, 2016
AB2251 Amended April 20, 2016
AB2251 Amended March 28, 2016
AB2251 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2251 Chaptered September 29, 2016
AB2251 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB2251 Amended August 19, 2016
AB2251 Amended August 1, 2016
AB2251 Amended June 13, 2016
AB2251 Amended May 31, 2016
AB2251 Amended May 10, 2016
AB2251 Amended April 20, 2016
AB2251 Amended March 28, 2016
AB2251 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare