California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2384 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2016

Amended

Bill June 6, 2016
Bill April 6, 2016
Bill March 15, 2016