|
09/14/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 358, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6345.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5299.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4980.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4592.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|