California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2491 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 8, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016