LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2491
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2491
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2491
Compare Versions
AB2491 Chaptered September 14, 2016
AB2491 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB2491 Amended August 19, 2016
AB2491 Amended August 8, 2016
AB2491 Amended June 13, 2016
AB2491 Amended April 20, 2016
AB2491 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2491 Chaptered September 14, 2016
AB2491 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB2491 Amended August 19, 2016
AB2491 Amended August 8, 2016
AB2491 Amended June 13, 2016
AB2491 Amended April 20, 2016
AB2491 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare