|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 764, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 6296.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5241.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 20. Page 4892.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|