California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2686 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill June 16, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill May 3, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016