LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2686
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2686
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2686
Compare Versions
AB2686 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB2686 Enrolled August 29, 2016
AB2686 Amended June 16, 2016
AB2686 Amended June 14, 2016
AB2686 Amended May 3, 2016
AB2686 Amended April 20, 2016
AB2686 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2686 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB2686 Enrolled August 29, 2016
AB2686 Amended June 16, 2016
AB2686 Amended June 14, 2016
AB2686 Amended May 3, 2016
AB2686 Amended April 20, 2016
AB2686 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare