|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 736, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 6527.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 5058.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 32. Page 1865.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|