California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB278 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 11, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill June 1, 2016
Bill February 18, 2016
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015
Bill March 18, 2015