LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB278
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB278
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB278
Compare Versions
AB278 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB278 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB278 Amended August 11, 2016
AB278 Amended June 20, 2016
AB278 Amended June 14, 2016
AB278 Amended June 1, 2016
AB278 Amended February 18, 2016
AB278 Amended June 1, 2015
AB278 Amended April 13, 2015
AB278 Amended April 7, 2015
AB278 Amended March 18, 2015
AB278 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB278 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB278 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB278 Amended August 11, 2016
AB278 Amended June 20, 2016
AB278 Amended June 14, 2016
AB278 Amended June 1, 2016
AB278 Amended February 18, 2016
AB278 Amended June 1, 2015
AB278 Amended April 13, 2015
AB278 Amended April 7, 2015
AB278 Amended March 18, 2015
AB278 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare