|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 682, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6433.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5308.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1799.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|