LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB287
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB287
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB287
Compare Versions
AB287 Chaptered September 27, 2016
AB287 Enrolled September 1, 2016
AB287 Amended August 19, 2016
AB287 Amended August 15, 2016
AB287 Amended August 2, 2016
AB287 Amended June 13, 2016
AB287 Amended June 6, 2016
AB287 Amended May 28, 2015
AB287 Amended May 4, 2015
AB287 Amended March 23, 2015
AB287 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB287 Chaptered September 27, 2016
AB287 Enrolled September 1, 2016
AB287 Amended August 19, 2016
AB287 Amended August 15, 2016
AB287 Amended August 2, 2016
AB287 Amended June 13, 2016
AB287 Amended June 6, 2016
AB287 Amended May 28, 2015
AB287 Amended May 4, 2015
AB287 Amended March 23, 2015
AB287 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare