California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB287 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill June 6, 2016
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015
Bill March 23, 2015