|
09/12/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 284, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6051.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5020.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1226.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|