LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB291
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB291
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB291
Compare Versions
AB291 Chaptered September 12, 2016
AB291 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AB291 Amended August 3, 2016
AB291 Amended June 10, 2015
AB291 Amended April 23, 2015
AB291 Amended April 15, 2015
AB291 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB291 Chaptered September 12, 2016
AB291 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AB291 Amended August 3, 2016
AB291 Amended June 10, 2015
AB291 Amended April 23, 2015
AB291 Amended April 15, 2015
AB291 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare