California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB291 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2016

Amended

Bill August 3, 2016
Bill June 10, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015