|
09/14/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 345, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5876.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4954.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 3426.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|