California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB326 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2016

Amended

Bill June 9, 2016
Bill May 10, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016
Bill April 21, 2015