LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB326
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB326
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB326
Compare Versions
AB326 Chaptered September 14, 2016
AB326 Enrolled August 19, 2016
AB326 Amended June 9, 2016
AB326 Amended May 10, 2016
AB326 Amended January 4, 2016
AB326 Amended April 21, 2015
AB326 Introduced February 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB326 Chaptered September 14, 2016
AB326 Enrolled August 19, 2016
AB326 Amended June 9, 2016
AB326 Amended May 10, 2016
AB326 Amended January 4, 2016
AB326 Amended April 21, 2015
AB326 Introduced February 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare