|
09/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 680, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6528.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5296.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4966.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hueso. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4976.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c) .
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 5. Page 1858.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/01/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|