LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB33
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB33
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB33
Compare Versions
AB33 Chaptered September 26, 2016
AB33 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB33 Amended August 19, 2016
AB33 Amended August 2, 2016
AB33 Amended June 20, 2016
AB33 Amended June 6, 2016
AB33 Amended September 4, 2015
AB33 Amended August 18, 2015
AB33 Amended June 23, 2015
AB33 Amended June 1, 2015
AB33 Amended April 6, 2015
AB33 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB33 Chaptered September 26, 2016
AB33 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB33 Amended August 19, 2016
AB33 Amended August 2, 2016
AB33 Amended June 20, 2016
AB33 Amended June 6, 2016
AB33 Amended September 4, 2015
AB33 Amended August 18, 2015
AB33 Amended June 23, 2015
AB33 Amended June 1, 2015
AB33 Amended April 6, 2015
AB33 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare