California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB33 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill June 6, 2016
Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill June 23, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015