|
09/30/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 361, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2746.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2312.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1453.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|