LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB347
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB347
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB347
Compare Versions
AB347 Chaptered September 30, 2015
AB347 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB347 Amended August 18, 2015
AB347 Amended March 26, 2015
AB347 Introduced February 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB347 Chaptered September 30, 2015
AB347 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB347 Amended August 18, 2015
AB347 Amended March 26, 2015
AB347 Introduced February 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare