California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB347 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2015

Amended

Bill August 18, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015