Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5250.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 3474.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (January 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2016
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3367.) (pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|