California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB350 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 1, 2016
Bill February 29, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016