LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB350
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB350
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB350
Compare Versions
AB350 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB350 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB350 Amended August 17, 2016
AB350 Amended August 15, 2016
AB350 Amended June 1, 2016
AB350 Amended February 29, 2016
AB350 Amended January 4, 2016
AB350 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB350 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB350 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB350 Amended August 17, 2016
AB350 Amended August 15, 2016
AB350 Amended June 1, 2016
AB350 Amended February 29, 2016
AB350 Amended January 4, 2016
AB350 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare