|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3071.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 2625.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 2390.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 12. Page 1485.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/01/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|