LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB36
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB36
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB36
Compare Versions
AB36 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB36 Amended September 4, 2015
AB36 Amended August 24, 2015
AB36 Amended June 24, 2015
AB36 Amended April 27, 2015
AB36 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB36 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB36 Amended September 4, 2015
AB36 Amended August 24, 2015
AB36 Amended June 24, 2015
AB36 Amended April 27, 2015
AB36 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare