California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB36 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 24, 2015
Bill June 24, 2015
Bill April 27, 2015