Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2595.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U., & C. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1800.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|